Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Courtney Shepherd Worthington, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Richard Shepherd, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | |||
June 06, 2022 | |||
May 27, 2022 | |||
April 11, 2022 | |||
April 01, 2022 | |||
January 07, 2022 | |||
December 06, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
November 12, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
November 05, 2021 | |||
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.