Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Andrew Harris, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Angela Harris, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | |||
December 03, 2021 | |||
September 27, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Parenting Agreement | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Parenting Agreement | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Ntc Re Mediation/Orientation | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appoint Child Custody Mediator Tier I | |
June 11, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.