Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mark Tyburski, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Kelley Tyburski, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
December 10, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment | |
June 18, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Dissolution | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Dissolution | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Disclosure | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Default or Uncontested Judgment | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations, and Waivers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.