Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James Chillquist, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Jandrea Chillquist, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Acknowledgment of Receipt | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Disclosure | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Disclosure | |
April 22, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
April 13, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Notice to Opposing Party - ERH or OST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.