Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Samantha Linarez, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Shane Linarez, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | |||
April 27, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
April 26, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Request to Continue Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Continued Court Hearing | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Domestic Violence | |
April 16, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
April 16, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extend Expiration Date for Restraining Order | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Request for Personal Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.