Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gary Lucas, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Karen Lucas, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Findings and Order After Hearing | |
February 17, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
February 05, 2021 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
February 05, 2021 | Heard: No Settlement | ||
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Temp Judge | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Issues and Contentions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.