Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cristina Lizarraga, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Joseph Andrews, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
November 22, 2019 | Heard: Stipulation Entered | ||
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Restraining Order After Hearing | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Request to Continue Hearing | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
May 02, 2019 | Not Heard: Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.