Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Damia Spooner, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Brian Spooner, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions203 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Production of an Income and Expense Declaration After Judgment | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
June 23, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
December 24, 2019 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Restoration of Former Name | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment | |
July 12, 2019 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.