Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stacie Gunderson, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Aurora De Luquin, Jonathan Luquin Ramirez, Jorge Prado, represented by Kothary, Pritesh S Law Offices Of Santa Cruz, Cannon & Kothary, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | |||
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | General Denial | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Case Management Conference | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.