Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Steven Swanson, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Barnett & Linn, Linnlaw, A Law Corp., Roger Linn, represented by Dye, Peter William Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck Llp, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0045699 Swanson, Steven J. vs. Linn, Roger D., et al Defendants’ Motion to Compel Furthers to Form and Special Interrogatories, Set One: Defendants’ motion to compel furthers to form and special ... | |
March 22, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0045699 Swanson, Steven J. vs. Linn, Roger D., et al Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents Defendants’ motion to compel responses to requests for production of documen... | |
June 29, 2021 | |||
March 12, 2021 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
March 05, 2021 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
February 02, 2021 | Calendar Notes Adopted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.