Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Citizens For Responsible Growth, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against City Counsel For Town Of Loomis, Town Of Loomis, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0045539 CITIZENS FOR RESONSIBLE GROWTH v. TOWN OF LOOMIS Respondent City of Loomis’ (Loomis) Motion to Discharge Writ In the current request, Loomis seeks discharge of the peremptory writ issued ... | |
July 28, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0045539 CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE GROWTH v. TOWN OF LOOMIS The motion to discharge peremptory writ is continued to Thursday, August 4, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3, located at the Historic Au... | |
March 26, 2021 | |||
February 26, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
January 29, 2021 | Continued: Court (412110) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.