Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kandie Bryant, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 08, 2021 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 04, 2020 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.