Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vince Lera, filed a(n) Civil case against Maidu Sherali Llc, represented by Mehigan, Blair Winston Law Offices Of Richard M. Mehigan, Morris, David Robert, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time224 days |
Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 22, 2019Answer -
Date: January 28, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: April 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2019 | Not Heard: Dismissed | ||
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Dismissal | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full With Prejudice | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Continuance | |
May 03, 2019 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation Pro Tem Judge | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation Commissioner | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 12, 2019 | Heard: Continued (432110) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.