Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ashlee Hempt, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Andrea Merlino, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2014 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2016 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full With Prejudice | |
May 13, 2016 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
May 06, 2016 | Heard: Settled | ||
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
April 26, 2016 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement Settlement Conference | |
February 26, 2016 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
February 19, 2016 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.