Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Valpo-Llc, Omnel, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against John Tanner, Tanner Industries, Valpo-Llc, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2011 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Appeal - filed on 04/16/2012 | |
March 06, 2012 | Heard: Court Decision | ||
February 24, 2012 | Heard: Trial Date Confirmed (438130) | ||
February 21, 2012 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
December 02, 2011 | Continued: Parties (Stipulation) | ||
November 18, 2011 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
October 27, 2011 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
October 05, 2011 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
May 26, 2011 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
April 19, 2011 | Dropped from Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.