Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Julie Billings, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Katie Anderson, Matthew Burns, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2011 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full Without Prejudice | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
December 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.