Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Plaza Circle Partners, Llp, Patricia Edwards, Philip Edwards, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against , Plaza Circle Partners, Llc, Placer Sierra Bank, T.D. Service Company, Sacramento Commercial Bank, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2004 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2006 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
November 03, 2006 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
July 24, 2006 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
June 12, 2006 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
April 17, 2006 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
March 13, 2006 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
December 13, 2005 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
November 15, 2005 | Heard: Granted in Part (435221) | ||
November 03, 2005 | Motion Denied (434110) | ||
September 26, 2005 | Continued: Court (412110) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.