Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James Karpowicz, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Jim Dupzyk Concrete Pumping, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2002 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2003 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
August 05, 2003 | Docket Event | Arbitration | |
April 30, 2003 | Docket Event | Arbitration | |
April 10, 2003 | Docket Event | Notice Prospective Arbitrators | |
April 07, 2003 | Referred: Arbitration | ||
March 10, 2003 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
February 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.