Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alameda County Public Administrator, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: September 29, 2021Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on 10/06/2021
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Publication As to Albino Pereira Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: September 22, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.