We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
De Ocampo, Jason ,
filed a(n)
General Probate -
Probate
case
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Filing Date
August 27, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
General Probate
Other Parties
De Ocampo, Norma (Decedent)
Case Events for
De Ocampo, Jason v.
Date
Type
Description
September 07, 2021
Other Probate Petition
Judge: Ruben Sundeen
September 07, 2021
Docket Event
Order On Petition to Invalidate Advance Health Care Directive Filed
September 07, 2021
Docket Event
Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
September 07, 2021
Judge: Other Probate Petition
August 31, 2021
Docket Event
Hearing Reset to Probate 09/07/2021 02:30 PM D- 201
August 31, 2021
Docket Event
Examiner's Notes re Matter of Advance Healthcare Directive 9/7/2021 Hearing
Get Document
August 31, 2021
Docket Event
Order On Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on Petition to Invalidate Advance Health Care
August 30, 2021
Docket Event
Application Re: Advance/Special Setting Granted
Get Document
August 27, 2021
Docket Event
Application Re: Advance/Special Setting Filed for Jason De Ocampo - of Ex Parte Application to advan
Get Document
August 27, 2021
Docket Event
Probate 02/25/2022 01:30 PM D- 201
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.