Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pace, Sally, King, Mark, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra K. Bean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate |
||
June 30, 2021 |
Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
June 30, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate |
||
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Amber C. Haskett Esq., Re: Informal Discovery Conference Filed | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michael A. Schreiber Filed | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate 06/30/2021 02:30 PM D- 202 | |
April 22, 2021 |
Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person and Estate Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.