Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martin, Pedro Garcia, Lopez, Rudy Garcia, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sandra K. Bean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra K. Bean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryGuardian Of Minor - Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian - 5/27/2020 Hearing
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings - 5/27/2020 Hearing
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings - 5/22/2020 Hearing
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian 5/22/2020 Hearing
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship Filed | |
May 27, 2020 |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
May 27, 2020 |
Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings
Judge: Sandra K. Bean |
||
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Guardianship Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings Granted | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF UNAVAILABILITY Filed | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person Granted | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian of Minor Pedro Garcia Martin Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.