Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gonzales, David Gerald, Gonzales, Aurora, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 09, 2019 |
CategoryGuardian Of Minor - Person |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (updated) - hearing on 8/28/20
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re Reconsideration of Temporary Guardianship set on 6/28/19
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re : Petition for Visitation - hearing on 8/28/20
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian hearing on 10/4/19
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (updated) - hearing on 7/2/20
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (updated) - hearing on 10/6/20
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re : Petition for Visitation (updated) - hearing on 10/6/20
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (updated) - hearing on 5/18/21
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re : Petition for Visitation (updated) - hearing on 5/18/21
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 |
Judge: Status Report |
||
August 10, 2021 |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Guardianship Hearing Commenced and Completed | |
August 10, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
||
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Order After Hearing Filed | |
June 21, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
||
June 18, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
||
June 15, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
||
June 14, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person |
||
June 08, 2021 |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.