Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blueford, John, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2019 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Waiver Of Service of Notice of Admin. Onita Brown Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate (updated) - hearing on 7/16/19
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal :: Final Filed
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate (updated) - hearing on 6/13/19
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Report of Sale and Petition for Order Confirming Sale of Real Property Filed by John Blueford
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate - hearing on 6/4/19
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Waiver Of Service of Notice of Admin. El Reno Brown Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Request for Special Notice Filed for Third Party
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration of John Blueford 2 Filed
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Order Confirming Sale of Real Property (Decedents Estates) Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Assignment #1 Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest Filed
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Probate 12/11/2020 03:30 PM D- 201
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Special Notice Filed for Third Party
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Administration to Creditors Filed
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Declaration of John Blueford 1 Filed
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Sale of Real Property (updated) - hearing on 1/22/20
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned without Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Waiver Of Service of Notice of Admin. Luke Blueford Filed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to John Blueford Filed
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Creditor's Claims from Travis Credit Union for $9,728.62 Filed
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Assigment Filed
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Report of Sale and Petition for Order Confirming Sale of Real Property Filed by John Blueford
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to John Blueford Filed
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Sale of Real Property - hearing on 12/17/19
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of of Assignment Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Arlett Jemaine Blueford Filed
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration of John Blueford 3 Filed
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Sale of Real Property (updated) - hearing on 1/22/20
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for John Blueford - for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration of John Blueford Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Assignment of Interest of Estate Filed
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing with Clerk's Certificate of Posting Filed
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Return Letter re: Ex-Parte Petition for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account Filed
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for John Blueford - Withdrawal of Funds
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment Filed
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Probate 06/09/2021 01:30 PM D- 201
Date: April 15, 2021Probate 12/11/2020 03:30 PM D- 201
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Probate Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Distribution (Final; updated) - hearing on 3/19/21
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Distribution (Final) - hearing on 3/19/21
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for John Blueford
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by John Blueford
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Letter re Court Reporter Fee Filed
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: April 21, 2021Examiner's Notes: Distribution (Final; updated) - hearing on 6/9/21
Date: May 20, 2021Hearing Reset to Probate 12/08/2021 01:30 PM D- 201
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for John Blueford
Date: April 21, 2021Petition Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for John Blueford - Petition for Withdrawal of Funds from Bl;ocked
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration of John Blueford Filed
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.