Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patterson, Leilani, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryGuardian Of Minor - Person |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Examiner's Notes re (Reconsideration of Temp. Grdshp) - hearing on 3/8/19
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (updated) - hearing on 5/23/19
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (Recon. of Temp. Grdship; update) - hearing on 3/8/19
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian hearing on 4/25/19
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re EBCLO Fee Petition- Hearing 5/29/20
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Guardian (updated) - hearing on 6/28/19
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.