Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Horton, David, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelbert C. Gee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2018 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00AMENDED Petition for Final Distribution Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Proof of Publication As to David Horton Filed
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Declaration of George W. Ryan Filed
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Filed
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: June 18, 2021Examiner's Notes: Distribution (Final) - hearing on 7/7/21
Date: June 14, 2021Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by David Horton
Date: April 09, 2021Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate Hearing 1/9/19
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Waiver of Hearing Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Waiver of Account Filed by David Horton
Date: April 09, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.