Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Valerie S., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoscelyn C. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2017 |
CategoryProbate-Will & Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time517 days |
Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate 12/5/2017
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Executor Filed
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00First Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Creditor's Claims For $9,140.05 from Bank of America, N. A. Filed
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Decree Final Distribution Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Valerie S. Garcia
Date: December 13, 2018Waiver of Account Michael J. Sinnott Filed by Valerie S. Garcia
Date: November 20, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Waiver of Account Scott O. Sinnott Filed by Valerie S. Garcia
Date: November 20, 2018Letters of Testamentary Filed
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Will Dated Filed
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Affidavit of Publication Filed
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 02, 2019Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Valerie S. Garcia Filed
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Valerie S. Garcia
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.