Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Liu, Rio-Ping, Chak, Suzanna, Chak, Randy, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2017 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan reviewed by CI, no concerns okay to drop.
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan /Status Report reviewed by CI, okay to drop.
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan /Status Rprt reviewed by CI, clerk set NCD.
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition to Appoint Conservator on for 11/30/2017
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan /Status Report reviewed & OK. No issues noted.
Date: January 27, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.