Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Matter of Sebastian Vasquez

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month, 3 weeks

Case Overview

On March 17, 2014 A Civil case was filed by Vasquez, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

March 17, 2014

Last Refreshed

Feb 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Compromise of Minor's Claim

Practice Area

Probate

Matter Type

General Probate

Case Cycle Time

213 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Probate Hearing Dropped from dept: 201 date: 10/17/2014 time: 09:30 AM
Docket Event Receipt/Acknowledgement of Deposit Per Court Order Filed
Docket Event Examiner's Notes re OSC on for 10/17/2014
Proof of Blocked Account

judge: Sandra K. Bean

Docket Event Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 10/17/2014 time: 09:30 AM
Docket Event Order to Show Cause Filed
Docket Event Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Docket Event Examiner's Notes re compliance hearing on for 9/16/2014 for proof of blocked account
Proof of Blocked Account

judge: Sandra K. Bean

Docket Event Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 09/16/2014 time: 11:00 AM
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.