Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parker, Steven C., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Cecilia P. Castellanos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCecilia P. Castellanos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2013 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time245 days |
Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Petition for Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2013-01-16T00:00:00Decree Final Distribution Filed
Date: September 18, 2013Letters of Administration Filed
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Independent Admin of Estate - Consent Filed
Date: 2013-06-12T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on for 02/25/2013
Date: 2013-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Steven C. Parker Filed
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on for 03/27/2013
Date: 2013-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Steven C. Parker Filed
Date: 2013-02-05T00:00:00Waiver of Account Filed by Steven C. Parker
Date: August 07, 2013Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Steven C. Parker
Date: August 19, 2013Proposed Order Received
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Satisfaction and Release of Claim Filed by Steven C. Parker
Date: August 07, 2013Inventory and Appraisal Final Filed
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Administrator Filed
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: September 18, 2013Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Steven C. Parker
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: September 09, 2013Creditor's Claims from AscensionPoint Recovery Services,LLC/ amt. $3,091.45 Filed
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.