Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tiggard, Harry O, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2012 |
CategoryProbate-Will & Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time545 days |
Declaration of Brian D.Young Filed
Date: 2012-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2012-05-22T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Harry O Tiggard Filed
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Petition for Probate on for 07/10/2012
Date: 2012-07-03T00:00:00Letters of Testamentary Filed
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed
Date: 2012-05-22T00:00:00Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Executor Harry O Tiggard Filed
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2012-05-29T00:00:00Will Dated June 18, 2001 at Oakland, CA Filed
Date: 2012-05-22T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Ann Muthschler Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Creditor's Claims from State of California/ amt $4,330.22 Filed
Date: 2012-09-10T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Winona Mutschler Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Receipt on Distribution by Party Jason Loring Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Inventory and Appraisal Supplemental & Property Tax Certificate Filed
Date: 2013-07-15T00:00:00Declaration of Attorney Filed
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Request for Special Notice Filed
Date: 2012-08-27T00:00:00Satisfaction and Release of Claim Filed by Harry O Tiggard
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Exhibits Received
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Decree Final Distribution Filed
Date: 2013-08-27T00:00:00Creditor's Claims is Allowed to Pharmecica amount $108.59 Filed
Date: 2012-09-19T00:00:00Notice of filing Inventory Filed
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Stacy Tiggard Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Proposed Order Received
Date: 2013-07-29T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Elizabeth Marrufo Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Inventory and Appraisal Filed
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Supoplemental Filed
Date: 2012-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Of Filing Inventory Filed
Date: 2012-11-27T00:00:00Bond Filed for Petitioner
Date: 2012-07-11T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Kathryn Tiggard Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Creditor's Claims frm PharMerica in the amt of $108.59 Filed
Date: 2012-08-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Witdrawal of Request For Special Notice Filed
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution Filed by Harry O Tiggard
Date: 2013-07-22T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal Filed
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party David Buseman Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Creditor's Claims frm STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD for $4326.99 Filed
Date: 2012-08-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous Withdrawal of Claim Filed
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Robert W. Jacskon Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Receipt on Distribution by Party Stephaine Chew Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Receipt on Distribution by Party Merrill-Lea Donehue Filed
Date: November 18, 2013Declaration under Probate Code 13100-13116 by Elizabeth Marrufo, beneficiary Filed
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Mary Teichmann Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Emily Wilson Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Rose Luczak Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party April Hopkins Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Foster J. Donehue Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Scott Gurley Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Jim Buseman Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Helen Tiggard Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Tonya Fischer Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Robert Boese Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Diana Luczak Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Allison Lindquist Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Merle Boese Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00Receipt on Distribution by Party Barbara Addicott Filed
Date: 2013-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.