Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Angel Gallegos, Jose Angel Gallegos, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices Apc, against General Motors, Llc, represented by Roger Ryan Bracken, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Chad W. Firetag presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChad W. Firetag Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Reply in Support of General Motors LLC's Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Plaintiffs' Complaint
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order: Demurrer to Complaint
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Demurrer on Complaint of JOSE ANGEL GALLEGOS
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order: Demurrer to Complaint
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of JOSE ANGEL GALLEGOS
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: April 21, 2021Minute Order: Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Complaint
Date: March 18, 2021TENTATIVE RULING DATED 3-18-21 -ORDERED FILED-
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: April 07, 2021Minute Order: Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Complaint
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Opposition to defendant's motion to strike
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 29, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: July 29, 20211st Amended Complaint JOSE ANGEL GALLEGOS
Date: April 19, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2021Reply in support of General Motors LLC's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Opposition to defendant's demurrer
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration of Roger Bracken in support of Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of GALLEGOS and filed.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint on Complaint of JOSE ANGEL GALLEGOS
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Complaint on Complaint of JOSE ANGEL GALLEGOS
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Motion to Strike Punitive Damages on Complaint of JOSE ANGEL GALLEGOS
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.