Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Roy C Easley, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Talkov Law Corp, against Beatriz Mendoza, Daniel Mendoza, Ryan Steven Mendoza, Ser-U-Tuf Inc, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with John W. Vineyard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Vineyard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 13, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: March 13, 2024Notice of Status Conference Hearing
Date: March 13, 2024Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 11, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: December 08, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 08, 2023Minute Order: Status Conference Hearing
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2023-05-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Declaration of Scott Talkov in re OSC for Failure to File a Default Judgment
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Declaration of Scott Talkov in re OSC for Failure to File a Default Judgment
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference Hearing
Date: 2023-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order: Status Conference re:
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Interlocutory Judgment of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Service on Interlocutory Judgment on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Interlocutory Judgment of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Interlocutory Judgment of Partition by Sale and Appointment of Referee
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher M. Kiernan in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: 2022-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered) on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher M Kiernan in Response to Order to Show Cause on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order on Ex Parte Application to Substitute
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Ex Parte Application to Substitute Scott A. Easley, as Trustee
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion continuance of hearing(s)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Supplemental TO APPLICATION FOR ORDER AND PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action Pursuant to CCP § 405.20 (Lis Pendens)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Complaint of ROY C EASLEY
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Supplemental to Application for Order and Publication of Summons
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continuance of hearing(s)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action Pursuant to CCP 405.20
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of EASLEY and filed.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.