Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jason Adams, Sally Adams, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rosner, Barry, Babbitt, Llp, against General Motors Llc, represented by Roger Ryan Bracken, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Ottolia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff's Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fees
Date: April 12, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: April 14, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint of JASON ADAMS
Date: October 06, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00General Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint on Complaint of JASON ADAMS
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of JASON ADAMS
Date: July 26, 2021Affidavit VENUE by JASON ADAMS, SALLY ADAMS filed
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT/CMC.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of ADAMS and filed.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92531.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Affidavit OF VENUE by JASON ADAMS, SALLY ADAMS filed
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.