Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elizabeth Sandoval, George Gallardo, Marcial Gallardo, Mary Gallardo, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mccune Wright Arevalo, Llp, Richard Franklin Ingle, against Caesar Gallardo, George Gallardo, Marcel Gallardo, Ramona Rehabilitation And Postacute Care I, Ramona Rehabilitation And Post Acute Care Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Unrepresented, Wendy E. Coulston, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Harold W. Hopp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold W. Hopp Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: February 21, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: February 21, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 02, 2022Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter - Petition to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Discovery
Date: March 02, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: March 02, 2022Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted
Date: March 02, 2022Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: February 22, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Declaration of Ramona Rehabilitation and Post Acute Care Inc
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Discovery on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Declaration of Jenny Kovar in support of Petition to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continuance of hearing(s)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:001st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Statement Pursuant to CCP 337.32 filed by ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service re: substitution of attorney - civil (without court order) via electronic service
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint ELIZABETH SANDOVAL
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of SANDOVAL and filed.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.