Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Lorenza Maribel Arias, Office Depot Inc, Robert Glen Gourlay, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brian Philip Tapper, Law Offices Of Jacob Emrani, against Cory Ann Ramirez, Lorenza Maribel Arias, represented by Christopher Ortega, Keith Leonard Shoji, Matthew Jason Trostler, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with John W. Vineyard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Vineyard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto |
Last RefreshedJune 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference
Date: May 26, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: May 15, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: May 12, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: May 12, 2023Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: May 12, 2023Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Ex Parte Application
Date: 2023-05-12T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Trial and Order
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Court Ruling (eFiling)
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Plaintiff's Mediation Brief
Date: 2023-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Complete Mediation
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement (ADR-100)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Complete Mediation
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment of Court Mediator
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Court Assigned Mediator
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Court Ordered Mediation
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of TBD
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Court Assigned Mediator
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Set Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Court Ordered Mediation
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees.
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Declaration of Matthew J. Trostler
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Amended Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint of ROBERT GLEN GOURLAY
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continuance of hearing(s)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint of ROBERT GLEN GOURLAY
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury and Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint of ROBERT GLEN GOURLAY
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Demand for Trial by Jury
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint of ROBERT GLEN GOURLAY
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of LORENZA MARIBEL ARIAS
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Summons Cross-Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence re: Cory Ann Ramirez
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint of ROBERT GLEN GOURLAY
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of TBD
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint of ROBERT GLEN GOURLAY
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order: Non-Proof of Service Clerk's Tracking Hearing (Non-Appearance)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint for Full Indemnity, Partial Indemnification, Apportionment and Declaratory Relief
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507.
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of GOURLAY and filed.
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.