Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jose Velazquez Fuentes, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Gomez & Simone, against Alejandro Velazquez, represented by Brian F. Doyle, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Irma Poole Asberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIrma Poole Asberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)
Date: June 15, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 15, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: June 09, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: April 13, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail re: defendant's case management statement
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS on Complaint of JOSE VELAZQUEZ FUENTES
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service - Civil
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for all Purposes.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92883.
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of FUENTES and filed.
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.