Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael & Associates, against Elaine M Sink, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2020 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING | ||
February 16, 2021 |
NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) Vacated |
||
October 26, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/19/2020 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SERVED ON ELAINE M SINK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/24/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE) Not Applicable |
||
October 21, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 | CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02. (RIVERSIDE) | ||
October 19, 2020 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/16/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER | ||
October 19, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/19/2020 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92584. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.