Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by American Express Legal, against Joseph Sontag, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2020 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING | ||
February 16, 2021 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE) | ||
October 20, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 |
COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/19/2020 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 19, 2020 | NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/16/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER | ||
October 19, 2020 | CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE) | ||
October 19, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509. Not Applicable |
||
April 19, 2020 | Hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.