Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Housing Group Fund 401K Pension Plan, Housing Group Fund401K Pension Plan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mckenna Brink Signorotti Llp, against Victor Aguilar, represented by Gilbert Martinez Gutierrez, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Godofredo Magno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGodofredo Magno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Notice of Document Return.
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: January 10, 2022Proposed Judgment
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: November 02, 2021Request for Judicial Notice.
Date: November 01, 2021Separate statement of undisputed facts on Complaint of HOUSING GROUP FUND 401K PENSION PLAN
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of HOUSING GROUP FUND 401K PENSION PLAN
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint of HOUSING GROUP FUND 401K PENSION PLAN
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Set Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Returned Mail
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Supplemental Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Amended Summons Issued and Filed.
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint of HOUSING GROUP FUND 401K PENSION PLAN
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of HOUSING GROUP FUND 401K PENSION PLAN and filed.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92571.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.