Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Western Equity Partners, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by De Novo Law Firm, against Phyllis Song, Huieng Song, Phyllis Savanh, Sys Savanh, Win Re Group, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Irma Poole Asberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIrma Poole Asberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: May 27, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Declaration of Benjamin Yrungaray in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: March 18, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: May 26, 2022Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons Issued on 1st Amended Complaint of WESTERN EQUITY PARTNERS, INC. and filed.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 23, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing (Civil)
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of WESTERN EQUITY PARTNERS, INC.
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint of WESTERN EQUITY PARTNERS, INC.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration of Benjamin Yrungaray in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint of WESTERN EQUITY PARTNERS, INC.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:001st Amended Complaint of WESTERN EQUITY PARTNERS, INC. Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of WESTERN EQUITY PARTNERS, INC. and filed.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.