Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
J Humberto Torres Renteria, Maria S Torres, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against Dpdw Inc, Fca Us Llc, represented by Nixon Peabody Llp, Spencer Peter Hugret, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Godofredo Magno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGodofredo Magno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: January 10, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: January 10, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 10, 2022ORDER BY STIP RE PLAS' ATTY'S FEES, COSTS & EXPENSES
Date: January 05, 2022Declaration of Maxwell Kreymer re Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: December 27, 2021Notice OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL
Date: August 03, 2021Notice OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint of J HUMBERTO TORRES RENTERIA
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint of J HUMBERTO TORRES RENTERIA
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Informal Discover Conference
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Informal Discover Conference
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Defendants' Notice of Entry of of Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion continuance of hearing(s)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Defendant DPDW, Inc's Answer to Complaint on Complaint of J HUMBERTO TORRES RENTERIA
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Set Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint of J HUMBERTO TORRES RENTERIA
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial by J HUMBERTO TORRES RENTERIA, MARIA S TORRES filed
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Answer to Complaint of RENTERIA by FCA US LLC represented by NIXON PEABODY LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of RENTERIA and filed.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92555.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT/CMC.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Stipulation and protective order - confidential designation only
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.