Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Francheska Lewis, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mahoney Law Group, against Felyn Fillon, Mcmanga Foods, Inc, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Carol A. Greene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol A. Greene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Minute Order: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Settlement Pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b).
Date: January 22, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of FRANCHESKA LEWIS
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of FRANCHESKA LEWIS
Date: December 29, 2020Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed.
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement by FRANCHESKA LEWIS filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MCMANGA FOODS, INC
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of LEWIS and filed.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92518.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FRANCHESKA LEWIS
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 06/23/20.
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to continue the order to show cause hearing
Date: January 07, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.