Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael & Associates Pc, against Concha Monte, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Randall S. Stamen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall S. Stamen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCollections (Other)-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | COURT TRIAL - LONG CAUSE | ||
September 10, 2020 |
TRIAL SETTING ORDER FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL S STAMEN Not Applicable |
||
September 09, 2020 |
TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Hearing Held |
||
August 17, 2020 |
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 09/09/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT 7. Not Applicable |
||
June 02, 2020 |
TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Continued Not Heard |
||
June 02, 2020 |
CONCHA MONTE/PRO/PER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A TIMELY CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CRC 3.725(A)). Vacated |
||
May 29, 2020 |
COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONTINUES TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HEARING Completed |
||
May 29, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. Not Applicable |
||
May 19, 2020 |
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 06/02/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT 7. Not Applicable |
||
May 07, 2020 |
PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 2020-17 DATED APRIL 27, 2020 AUTHORIZED PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 10.603, THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR 06/02/20 AT 08:30 IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.