Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gregory Lee-Leon, Miguel Lee-Leon, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Walter Clark Legalgroup, against Jonathon Raymond Schiller, represented by Winet Patrick Gayer Creighton & Hanes, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Chad W. Firetag presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChad W. Firetag Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateApril 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial455 days |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | JURY TRIAL | ||
January 07, 2021 | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 09, 2020 | HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL - RES240284 | ||
December 09, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
The Court denies the motion to continue trial currently set for January 22, 2021. As a practical matter, however, the Court orders the parties to be present at oral argument, telephonically, as the Co...
Judge: Chad Firetag |
|
November 06, 2020 |
FEE PAID FOR ON-LINE RESERVATION OF MOTION ($60.00). CONFIRMATION NUMBER RES240284 FOR HEARING RESERVED ON 12/09/20. Not Applicable |
||
November 06, 2020 |
COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY DEFENDANT FOR HEARING 12/09/20. Not Applicable |
||
November 05, 2020 | COURT REPORTER HEARING FEE FOR ONE HOUR OR LESS PAID BY DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00; FOR HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL ON 12/09/2020. | ||
November 05, 2020 | HEARING RESERVED SET 12/09/20 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 03 - RES240284 | ||
November 05, 2020 | ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. | ||
November 03, 2020 |
HEARING RE: TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Completed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.