Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alvon Callier, Bennie Benton Iii, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by In Pro Per, Pro Per, against Dorothea E Williams, George A Williams, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Ottolia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: November 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 22, 2021Order Plaintiff Bennie Benton III, and Alvon Callier Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment
Date: November 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 23, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: June 23, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: March 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of BENNIE BENTON III
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Motion to/for ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT by BENNIE BENTON III, ALVON CALLIER filed
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE.
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Hearing re Default Prove Up.
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS, DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of COURT Default Judgment (Default ONLY previously entered) filed.
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Filed: DECLARATION RE: INTEREST
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Declaration of BENNIE BENTON III IN SUPPORT OF APPL FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PER CCP SECTION 585(D) filed
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by BENNIE BENTON III, ALVON CALLIER
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint of BENTON III filed.
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove up as to DOROTHEA E WILLIAMS, GEORGE A WILLIAMS.
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Declaration of /RE INTEREST filed
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Hearing re Default Prove Up.
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 03/06/19.
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint of BENTON III as to GEORGE A WILLIAMS filed.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of COURT Default Judgment (Default ONLY previously entered) filed.
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by BENNIE BENTON III, ALVON CALLIER
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of BENTON III and filed.
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92570.
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.