Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
I Ride Like A Star Llc, Jojo Limo Service Llc, I Ride Like A Starllc, Enrique Herrera, filed a(n) Civil case represented by In Pro Per, Pro Per, against I Ride Like A Star Llc, Jojo Limo Service Llc, John Gabin Ahonoukoun, Anne Helene Verdier, I Ride Like A Starllc, (total of 5) See All represented by The Law Offices Of R. Grace Rodriguez, Kevin Jamison Law Pc, The Law Offices Ofr. Grace Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Chad W. Firetag presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChad W. Firetag Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateMay 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
||
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
||
Order of Dismissal and Reservation under CCP 664.6
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: December 24, 2020Notice of Document Return.
Date: January 21, 2021Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: October 28, 2020TRIAL SETTING ORDER; JUDGE CHAD W. FIRETAG
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Amendment to Trial Setting Order
Date: December 14, 2020System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 04/14/20.
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing on OSC re: Failure to Complete Mediation
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference (Notice)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Filed: PLTF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC HRG RE FAILURE TO COMPLETE COURT MEDIATION.
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Response to OSC HEARING by ENRIQUE HERRERA filed.
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of court assigned mediator - MKW as Mediator Kent Warner
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel forJOJO LIMO SERVICE LLC byKEVIN JAMINSON LAW PC filed (Form MC-051).
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel forI RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC byKEVIN JAMISON LAW PC filed (Form MC-051).
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal to Court Ordered Mediation filed by JOBI HALPER. (Assignment)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of court assigned mediator - MBHS as Mediator Berl H Selski
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of court assigned mediator - MJH as Mediator Jobi Halper
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice OF TAKING OFF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS OFF CALENDAR by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN filed.
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 05/21/19.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration of ANNE HELENE VERDIER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration of JUSTIN F CRONIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS FILED
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Motion to/for JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN filed
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: OSC re: Dismissal of any party not At-Issue.
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Declaration of Ethan Nelson RE OSC RE Sanctions filed
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order: VACATE Case Management and set Trial Setting
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by ENRIQUE HERRERA
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by ANNE HELENE VERDIER, JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN, JOJO LIMO SERVICE LLC
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Order GRANTING STIP TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR; Honorable Judge Irma Poole Asberry.
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:001st Amended Complaint of HERRERA Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEF'S ANNE HELENE VERDIER & JOJO LIMO SERVICE TO APPEAR filed.
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to MOTION TO STRIKE by JOJO LIMO SERVICE LLC filed.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of KEVIN D JAMISON IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER filed
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of JUSTIN F CRONIN IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by JOJO LIMO SERVICE LLC.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT ANNE HELENE VERDIER FILED
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of KEVIN D JAMISON IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of JUSTIN F CRONIN IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS filed
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT ANNE VERDIER FILED
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proposed Order re: MTN TO STRIKE for hearing on 01/03/19 submitted by ANNE HELENE VERDIER.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER & MTN/STRIKE BY DFT ANNE HELENE VERDIER FILED
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to MITON TO STRIKE by ANNE HELENE VERDIER filed.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proposed Order re: Demurrer for hearing on 01/02/19 submitted by JOJO LIMO SERVICE LLC.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of Justin F.Cronin in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike filed
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin D.Jamison in Supp of Demurrer and Mtn Strike filed
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of/to Demurrer by JOJO LIMO SERVICE LLC filed.
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Stipulation to VACATE REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT & SET ASIDE filed.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Proposed Order re: DEMURRER for hearing on 11/29/18 submitted by I RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Proposed Order re: MTN TO STRIKE for hearing on 11/29/18 submitted by I RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Declaration of OF J F CRONIN IN SUPT OF DEMURRER AND MTN TO STRIKE BY JOHN GABIN AHOUNKOUN filed
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to MTN TO STRIKE by I RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC filed.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to DEMURRER by I RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC filed.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by I RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to MOTION TO STRIKE by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN filed.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: CMC.
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92879.
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proposed Order re: DEMURRER for hearing on 11/29/18 submitted by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Memo of Points & Authorities in SUPPORT of/to DEMURRER by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN filed.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Proposed Order re: MTN TO STRIKE for hearing on 11/29/18 submitted by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint of HERRERA by I RIDE LIKE A STAR LLC represented by KEVIN JAMISON LAW PC filed.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint of HERRERA by JOHN GABIN AHONOUKOUN represented by KEVIN JAMISON LAW PC filed.
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of HERRERA and filed.
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.