Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jane Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Taylor & Ring, against Crst Expedited Inc, Eric Horton, represented by Jackson Lewis, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, Smith, Doug, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Craig G. Riemer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig G. Riemer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateMay 04, 2018 |
CategoryOther-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
Time To Trial679 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | JURY TRIAL | ||
October 26, 2020 |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2018 OF JANE DOE REMOVE ATTORNEY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITHLLP FOR PARTY(S) CRST EXPEDITED INC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JACKSON LEWIS Not Applicable |
||
October 23, 2020 |
JURY TRIAL Continued Not Heard |
||
October 23, 2020 | Hearing | JURY TRIAL | |
October 21, 2020 |
HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDENCE AT DEPOSITION - RES226111 Calendared (Reservation Hearings) |
||
October 21, 2020 |
HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONEY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY CRST EXPEDITED INC Off-Calendar |
||
October 21, 2020 | Hearing | HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONEY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY CRST EXPEDITED INC | |
October 15, 2020 |
POS UNTIMELY - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER DEPO TESTIMONY AND PRODUCTIONS ON CALENDAR 10/21/20 IS UNTIMELY. Not Applicable |
||
October 14, 2020 |
DECLARATION TO TAKE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITIONS OFF-CALENDER FILED Not Applicable |
||
October 09, 2020 |
HEARING RESERVED FOR EX PARTE HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL - RES228627. Calendared (Reservation Hearings) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.