Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman Law Group, against Shawn Galvez, Jerry G Chen, Maria Perez Valdez, Lorena Semer, Cathey Losox, (total of 5) See All represented by Pro Per, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Albert J. Wojcik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlbert J. Wojcik Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer-Residential Under $10K (Ri)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time167 days |
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JERRY G CHEN IS GRANTED; CLERK M. CRIEL (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92555.
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00HEARING ON DEMURRER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 8/14/17 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 11 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 10/12/17 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 11
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AS TO MARIA PEREZ VALDEZ FILED
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR MARIA PEREZ VALDEZ WAS GRANTED FOR I; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO DFTS DEMURRER BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY SHAWN GALVEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK M. CRIEL (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (CM-180) FILED BY DEFENDANT, SHAWN GALVEZ
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRER BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JERRY G CHEN (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 7/28/17 AT 13:00 IN DEPT 11
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/05/2017 OF US BANK TRUST NA AND FILED.
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARIA PEREZ VALDEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK M. CRIEL (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/05/17 AT 8:00 IN CLER
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR JERRY G CHEN WAS GRANTED FOR I; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00COPY(S) MADE
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00NOSCUD HEARING SET FOR 09/05/17 AT 08:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE DISMISSAL SET
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SHAWN GALVEZ (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARIA PEREZ VALDEZ (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR SHAWN GALVEZ WAS GRANTED FOR I; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF TERMINATION/MODIFICATION OF STAY FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA. (FORM CM-181)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS.
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE MSJ FILED
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00HEARING SET 10/24/17 AT 13:00 IN DEPARTMENT 11
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00MEMO OF POINTS & AUTH RE NO BANKRUPTCY STAY IN EFFECT DUE TO DEF SHAWN GALVEZ CLAIMING PROTECTION
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: November 28, 2017SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT.
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: November 28, 2017ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.
Date: November 21, 2017NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00DECLARATION OF E RATLIFF IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE FAILURE TO COMPLY.
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RANDALL D NAIMAN IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: November 28, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED
Date: December 19, 2017DECLARATION OF GEORGE RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.