Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andrea Feodorov, Barbara Millsap, Dewey Cummins, Ellwyn Hughes, Sue Cummins, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Complex Unlimited Civil – Class Action case represented by Callahan, Thompson, Sherman & Caudill, against Anthony Bartoli And Rose Mary K Bartoli, J & H Asset Property Management Inc, J & H Real Estate Management Llc, represented by Callahan, Thompson, Sherman & Caudill, Dowdall Law Offices, Grimm, Vranjes & Greer Llp, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Craig G. Riemer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig G. Riemer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2016 |
CategoryComplex Unlimited Civil – Class Action |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
|
Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order: Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: April 14, 2022Order on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: August 04, 2022DECLARATION OF JENNIFER BELIVEAU REGARDING FINAL ACCOUNTING
Date: September 22, 2022Tentative Rulings for February 10, 2022
Date: February 10, 2022Declaration of Annette C Clark in Support of Request for Dismissal
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: March 10, 2022Minute Order: Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Declaration of Service on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Declaration of Zachary Cooley Regarding Notice and Settlement Administration
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Declaration of Gwendolyn "Sue" Cummins
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration of Barbara Millsap
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration of Ellwyn Hughes
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration of Andrea Feodorov
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration of Gregory D Stephan Esq in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration of Dewey Cummins
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Order on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Annette C Clark Filing Fully Executed Second Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Service on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration of MATTHEW CAMBER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration of Service on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00[Proposed] Order on Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Declaration of Service
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order: Status Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Joint Status Report
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Declaration of Ryan J. Carlson Filed In Support of/Concurrently with the Parties' Joint Status Report
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order: Status Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Stipulation and order to continue status conference; denied
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Joint Status Report
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re:
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference Hearing
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Amended Minute Order: Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proposed Order re: / contnue Trial Date on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order: Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration of Annette C Clark in support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration of Ryan J Carlson in support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Stipulation to Allow Trial Judge to Conduct Settlement Conference
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date on 3rd Amended Complaint of ANDREA FEODOROV
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order: Ruling on Matter Submitted
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Order re Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Defendants' mandatory settlement conference statement (CRC 3.1380(c)); Proof of service
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration of Service Re Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Oppositon to MSA and Additional Docs filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections to the Dec. of Gianni Cialini Filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Declaration of Gregory D. Stephan, Esq. in Support of Reply to Pltfs. Oppo. to Defts. MSA filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to the Dec. of James Joffee Filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Oppo. to Defts. MSJ Filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00ERRATA REGARDING NOTICE OF LODGMNT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Evidentiary Objctns to the Decl of James Joffee in Support of Motion for Sum Adjud filed
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Declaration of Ryan J Carlson in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication filed
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling 9-10-20
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Evidentiary Objctns to the Decl of Gianna Cialini in Support of Motion for Sum Adjud filed
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Objections to Decalration in support of Opposition to Motion for Relief from Forfeiture filed
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order Dated 09/01/20..
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to/for RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE OF RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES filed
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FORFEITURE OF RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL filed
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Amendment to Trial Setting Order; Honorable Judge Craig G Riemer
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Trial Setting Order; Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEE DEPOSIT by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES filed.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Declaration of GREGORY D. STEPHAN ESQ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT IF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS & SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FILED
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Order ON PARTIES' NOTICE OF CLASS CERTIFICATION denied. Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Filed: ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Joint STATUS REPORT filed.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 12/17/19.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case reassigned to Department 01 for all purposes.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES.
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Summons Issued on 3rd Amended Complaint of FEODOROV and filed.
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:003rd Amended Complaint of FEODOROV Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Order granting Class Certification; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Declaration of Annette C Clark ISO Pla's Reply to Deft's Oppo to Pla's Mtn for Class Certification filed
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES filed
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00DFTS OPPO TO PLTFFS SUPPL BRIEF RE:MTN FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION OF PROPOSED SEWER FILED
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00PLTFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE SEWER AND MAINENANCE CLASS AND FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00DFTS RESP/PLTFS OBJECTIONS/DFTS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED OPPO/PLTFS MTN/CLASS CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE:MTN FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS ISO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES filed
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Objection to Evidence submitted in oppo to Mtn for Class Certfc filed by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Supplemental BRIEF RE CLASS REP ISO MTN FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Declaration of ANNETTE C CARK filed
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re Precluding or Limiting Contact with Putative.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration of EDWARD L SCHUMANN filed
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice OF ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES filed.
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Declaration of EBY YIELDING filed
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Declaration of KATHLEEN SANCHEZ-CHANEY filed
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Case reassigned to Department 04 for all future proceedings. (Riverside)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00170.6 CCP filed by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES against Judge Sunshine S Sykes is granted.
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00DEFTS SUR-REPLY IN SUPT OF OPPO TO PLTFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION FILED
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re CONFIRM RECEIPT & CONSIDERATION/DFTS OPPO/MOTION.
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Order granting defendants exparte application to confirm courts receipt
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Reply to OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES filed
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Notice of Re-Assignment.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Re-Assignment to Department for All Purposes.
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Declaration of MATT CAMBER IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Reserved for: CLASS CERTIFICATION - RES85274
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Declaration of EDWARD G POOLE ESQ IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Declaration of ROBERT W THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00PLFTS PROPOSED TRIAL PLAN
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of CHARLES S RUSSELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Declaration of MICHAEL J WEILER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Motion to/for CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES filed
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Order re Motion for Class Certification; Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES.
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration of MICHAEL J WEILER IN SUPPORT OF PLTFFS EX PARTE filed
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing Re: Status Conference
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Declaration of Michael J. Weiler in Support of Amendment to Complaint to Fix Incorrect Name filed
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Case reassigned to Judge Craig G. Riemer in Department 05 for all future proceedings. (Riverside)
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Order Class Action Case Management Order #2; Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer.
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Order Joint statement of the parties regarding Case denied. Honorable Judge Sharon J. Waters.
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Leave to Amend 1st Amended Complaint of FEODOROV
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:002nd Amended Complaint of FEODOROV Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING CASE STATUS PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice OF ORDER TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT by ANDREA FEODOROV filed.
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT OF THE PPARTIES REGARDING CASE STATUS PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:001st Amended Complaint of FEODOROV Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed - Class Action. (Riverside)
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Declaration of TERRY R DOWDALL RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Declaration of TERRY R DOWDALL RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE filed
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00JOINT STATUS STATEMENT
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint of FEODOROV and filed.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint of FEODOROV Naming Does 01 to be J & H ASSET PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC filed.
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Order filed; Honorable Judge Sharon J. Waters.
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Declaration of ANNETTE C CARK IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to/for CLASS CERTIFICATION by ANDREA FEODOROV, ELLWYN HUGHES
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.